+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On April 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing Scheduled But Not Heard S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
On March 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing Scheduled But Not Heard S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
On March 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing Scheduled But Not Heard S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 848-Rupp and Kehoe
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor