+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
- Signed by Senate President Pro Tem
- Signed by House Speaker
- Delivered to Governor
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Utilities (Pursuant to H Rule 27.14)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Utilities
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Utility Infrastructure
- Referred H Select Committee on Utilities (Pursuant to H Rule 27.14)
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Utility Infrastructure
- Voted Do Pass H Utility Infrastructure
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Referred H Utility Infrastructure
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- H Second Read
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- H First Read
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Silvey)
- Perfected
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee w/SCS
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee (5527S.02C)
On January 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 838-Silvey and Walsh
On December 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (7)
5527S03.11H
Distributed
5527S03.08H
Distributed
5527S03.09H
Distributed
5527S03.06H
Distributed
5527S03.03H
Distributed
5527S03.05H
Distributed
5527S.03F
SS for SCS offered (Silvey)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor