+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On May 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 818-Parson, with SCS
On April 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On April 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Transportation Committee to Floor w/SCS
On March 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Transportation Committee - (5941S.02C)
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Transportation Committee
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Transportation Committee
On February 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 818-Parson
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor