+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- Referred H Budget
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- H Second Read
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- H First Read
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted
- Reported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee
- Voted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
- Perfected
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Bill placed on Informal Calendar
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Appropriations Committee
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Appropriations Committee
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Appropriations Committee
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Appropriations Committee
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 818-Brown
On December 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor