+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On May 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SBs 817 & 774-Parson, with SCS
On April 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On April 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee to Floor w/SCS
On April 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS SB's 817 & 774) S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee - 5729S.06C
On March 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
On February 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 817-Parson
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor