+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On May 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 816-Wieland, et al
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from S General Laws and Pensions Committee
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S General Laws and Pensions Committee
- Hearing Conducted S General Laws and Pensions Committee
On January 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing to be Continued S General Laws and Pensions Committee
- Hearing Conducted S General Laws and Pensions Committee
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S General Laws and Pensions Committee
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 816-Wieland and Walsh
On December 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Prefiled