+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 5, 2002 in the House:
- Referred H Miscellaneous Bills Committee
On February 19, 2002 in the House:
- H Second Read
On February 18, 2002 in the House:
- H First Read
On February 14, 2002 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - Consent
On January 31, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported From S Education Committee to Floor-Consent
On January 30, 2002 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Education Committee-Consent
- Hearing Conducted S Education Committee-Consent
On January 17, 2002 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Education Committee
On January 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- S First Read
On December 11, 2001 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor