+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On June 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 28, 2004 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by House Speaker
- Signed by Senate President Pro Tem
- Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
On May 14, 2004 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed
On May 13, 2004 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed to and Finally Passed
On May 13, 2004 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed
On May 7, 2004 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Agriculture Committee
On May 6, 2004 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Agriculture Committee
- Hearing Conducted H Agriculture Committee
On May 3, 2004 in the House:
- Referred H Agriculture Committee
On April 29, 2004 in the House:
- H Second Read
On April 28, 2004 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
On April 28, 2004 in the House:
- H First Read
On April 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
- Perfected
- SCS S adopted
- SA 3 to SCS S offered & defeated (Jacob)
- SA 2 to SCS S offered & withdrawn (Jacob)
- SA 1 to SCS S offered & withdrawn (Jacob)
On April 8, 2004 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On March 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported From S Agriculture, Conservation, Parks & Natural Resources Committee to Floor w/SCS
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Conservation, Parks and Natural Resources Committee (2964S.04C)
On January 29, 2004 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Agriculture, Conservation, Parks & Natural Resources Committee
On January 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Agriculture, Conservation, Parks & Natural Resources Committee
On January 7, 2004 in the Senate:
- S First Read
On December 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor