+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (0296S.02C)
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing Cancelled S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
On January 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 81-Dixon
On December 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor