+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 809-Brown, with SCS
On April 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee w/SCS
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee (4661S.02C)
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 809-Brown
On December 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor