+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 14, 2004 in the Senate:
- S Inf Calendar S Bills for Perfection
On April 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
- SA 2 to SS for SCS S offered (Steelman)
- SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & withdrawn (Steelman)
- SS for SCS S offered (Klindt) (2965S.04F)
On March 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On March 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported From S Small Business, Insurance & Industrial Relations Committee to Floor w/SCS
On February 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Small Business, Insurance and Industrial Relations Committee (2965S.02C)
On February 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Small Business, Insurance and Industrial Relations Committee
On January 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Small Business, Insurance and Industrial Relations Committee
On January 7, 2004 in the Senate:
- S First Read
On December 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor