+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 16, 2008 in the Senate:
- S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 809-Stouffer, with SCS, SS for SCS & SA 1 (pending)
On April 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
- SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered (Griesheimer)--(3492S03.05S)
- SS for SCS S offered (Stouffer)--(3492S.03F)
On March 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On February 21, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Transportation Committee to Floor w/SCS
On February 20, 2008 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Transportation Committee (3492S.02C)
On February 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Transportation Committee
On January 30, 2008 in the Senate:
- Hearing Cancelled S Transportation Committee
On January 10, 2008 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Transportation Committee
On January 9, 2008 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 809-Stouffer
On December 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor