+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (43)
On May 9, 2016 in the House:
- Defeated on H Third Reading
- HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Pierson)--(4922H04.32H)
- HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Lant)--(4922H04.04H)
- HCS, as amended, H adopted
- HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Alferman)--(4922H04.19H)
- HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (McGaugh)--(4922H04.03H)
- HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Solon)--(4922H04.02H)
- HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Fraker)--(4922H04.08H)
- HA 7 to HCS H offered & adopted (Rowden)--(4922H04.34H)
- HA 8 to HCS H offered & adopted (Fraker)--(4922H04.17H)
- HA 9 to HCS H offered & adopted (Walker)--(4922H04.18H)
- HA 10 to HCS H offered & adopted (Fitzpatrick)--(4922H04.21H)
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
- Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
On May 2, 2016 in the House:
- Referred H Fiscal Review Committee
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Commerce (Pursuant to H Rule 27.4)
On April 27, 2016 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Commerce (Pursuant to H Rule 27.4)
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Referred H Select Committee on Commerce (Pursuant to H Rule 27.4)
- Reported Do Pass H Economic Development & Business Attraction & Retention w/HCAs 1 & HCA 2
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Economic Development & Business Attraction & Retention w/Amendments
- Hearing Conducted H Economic Development & Business Attraction & Retention
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Referred H Economic Development & Business Attraction & Retention
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- H Second Read
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- H First Read
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
- Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability & Fiscal Oversight Committee (Fiscal Oversight)
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- SA 1 to SCS S offered (Schatz)
- SA 1 to SA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Keaveny)
- SA 2 to SA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Chappelle-Nadal)
- SA 1 to SCS, as amended, S adopted
- SA 2 to SCS S offered & adopted (Schaaf)
- SA 3 to SCS S offered & adopted (Sater)
- SCS, as amended, S adopted
- Perfected
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
- Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee w/SCS
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee (4922S.02C)
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 800-Sater, et al
On December 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (37)
4922H04.36H
Distributed
4922H04.01F
Distributed
4922H04.33H
Distributed
4922H04.32H
Adopted
4922H04.31H
Distributed
4922H04.34H
Adopted
4922H04.20H
Distributed
4922H04.30H
Distributed
4922H04.29H
Distributed
4922H04.27H
Distributed
4922H04.22H
Distributed
4922H04.23H
Distributed
4922H04.24H
Distributed
4922H04.25H
Distributed
4922H04.21H
Adopted
4922H04.19H
Adopted
4922H04.18H
Adopted
4922H04.17H
Adopted
4922H04.09H
Distributed
4922H04.16H
Distributed
4922H04.14H
Distributed
4922H04.01H
Distributed
4922H04.13H
Distributed
4922H04.11H
Distributed
4922H04.03H
Adopted
4922H04.02H
Adopted
4922H04.04H
Adopted
4922H04.08H
Adopted
4922H04.06H
Distributed
4922H04.05H
Distributed
4922S02.02H
Committee
4922S02.03H
Committee
4922S02.05S
SA 2 to SCS S offered & adopted (Schaaf)
4922S02.04S
SA 3 to SCS S offered (Sater)
4922S02.07S
SA 2 to SA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Chappelle-Nadal)
4922S02.06S
SA 1 to SA 1 to SCS S offered (Keaveny)
4922S02.03S
SA 1 to SCS S offered (Schatz)