+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 8, 2001 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Ways & Means Committee
On January 23, 2001 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Ways & Means Committee
On January 16, 2001 in the Senate:
- Hearing Scheduled But Not Heard
On January 10, 2001 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Ways & Means Committee
On January 3, 2001 in the Senate:
- S First Read
On December 1, 2000 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Scott
Type:
Primary Sponsor