+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On September 15, 2004 in the Senate:
- No motion made to override Governor's veto
On July 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by Governor
On May 28, 2004 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by House Speaker
- Signed by Senate President Pro Tem
- Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
On May 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed to and Finally Passed
- S Third Read and Passed
- S concurs in HCS
On May 11, 2004 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed - Consent
- HCS H adopted
On April 29, 2004 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass H Judiciary Committee-Consent
On April 28, 2004 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Judiciary Committee-Consent
On April 14, 2004 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Judiciary Committee
On April 1, 2004 in the House:
- Referred H Judiciary Committee
On March 30, 2004 in the House:
- H Second Read
On March 29, 2004 in the House:
- H First Read
On March 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - Consent
- SCS S adopted
On March 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- Motion to adopt SCS - withdrawn
On February 9, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported From S Financial & Gov. Org., Veterans' Affairs & Elections Committee to Floor w/SCS -Consent
On February 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Financial & Governmental Org., Veterans' Affairs & Elections Comm.(2727S.03)-Consent
On January 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Financial & Governmental Org., Veterans' Affairs & Elections Committee - Consent
On January 8, 2004 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Financial & Governmental Organization, Veterans' Affairs & Elections Committee
On January 7, 2004 in the Senate:
- S First Read
On December 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor