+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 26, 2006 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Professional Registration & Licensing Committee
On April 12, 2006 in the House:
- Referred H Professional Registration & Licensing Committee
On April 10, 2006 in the House:
- H Second Read
On April 6, 2006 in the House:
- H First Read
On April 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
On April 4, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee
- Perfected
- SCS S adopted
On March 15, 2006 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On March 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Financial & Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee to Floor w/SCS
On March 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Financial & Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee (4157S.03C)
On February 13, 2006 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Financial & Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
On February 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- Hearing Scheduled But Not Heard S Financial & Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
On January 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- Re-referred S Financial & Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
On January 11, 2006 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil & Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
On January 4, 2006 in the Senate:
- S First Read
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor