+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 24, 2008 in the House:
- Referred H Crime Prevention & Public Safety Committee
On April 2, 2008 in the House:
- H Second Read
On April 1, 2008 in the House:
- H First Read
On March 31, 2008 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - Consent
On March 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Judiciary and Civil & Criminal Jurisprudence Committee to Floor - Consent
On March 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil & Criminal Jurisprudence Committee - consent
On January 22, 2008 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil & Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
On January 10, 2008 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil & Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
On January 9, 2008 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 790-Champion
On December 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor