+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 11, 2009 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee
On May 7, 2009 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee
On April 29, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f)
- HCS Reported Do Pass H Elementary and Secondary Education Committee
On April 28, 2009 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Elementary and Secondary Education Committee
On April 14, 2009 in the House:
- Voted to return to committee of origin H Rules Committee
- Hearing Conducted H Rules Committee
On April 9, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f)
- Reported Do Pass H Elementary and Secondary Education Committee - Consent
On April 8, 2009 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Elementary and Secondary Education Committee
- Voted Do Pass H Elementary and Secondary Education Committee - Consent
On March 30, 2009 in the House:
- Referred H Elementary and Secondary Education Committee
On March 2, 2009 in the House:
- H Second Read
On February 26, 2009 in the House:
- H First Read
On February 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - Consent
On February 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Education Committee to Floor - Consent
On February 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Education Committee - Consent
On January 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Education Committee
On January 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Education Committee
On January 7, 2009 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 79-Wilson
On December 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor