+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 14, 2004 in the House:
- H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading
On May 5, 2004 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Tourism & Cultural Affairs Committee
On March 30, 2004 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Tourism & Cultural Affairs Committee
On March 16, 2004 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Tourism & Cultural Affairs Committee
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- Referred H Tourism & Cultural Affairs Committee
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- H Second Read
On March 2, 2004 in the House:
- H First Read (w/EC)
On March 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted - Consent
On February 9, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported From S Financial & Governmental Org., Vet. Affairs & Elections Committee to Floor - Consent
On February 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Financial & Governmental Org., Veterans' Affairs & Elections Committee -Consent
On January 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Financial & Governmental Org. Veterans' Affairs & Elections Committee - Consent
On January 8, 2004 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Financial & Governmental Organization, Veterans' Affairs & Elections Committee
On January 7, 2004 in the Senate:
- S First Read
On December 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor