+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 14, 2010 in the Senate:
- S Formal Calendar S Bills for Third Reading--SB 779-Bartle (In Fiscal Oversight)
On February 23, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee
On February 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Perfected, as amended
- SA 3 S offered & adopted (Justus)--(3561S02.04S)
- SA 2 S offered & adopted (Bartle)--(3561S02.03S)
- SA 1 S withdrawn
On February 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
- SA 1 S offered (Bartle)--(3561S02.01S)
On February 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee to Floor
On February 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
On February 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
On January 19, 2010 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
On January 14, 2010 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 779-Bartle
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor