+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 16, 2008 in the House:
- H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
On May 15, 2008 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee
- Hearing Conducted H Fiscal Review Committee
On May 5, 2008 in the House:
- Referred H Fiscal Review Committee
On May 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rules - HCS Reported Do Pass
On May 5, 2008 in the House:
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Hearing Conducted
On April 30, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(21)(f)
- HCS Reported Do Pass H Health Care Policy Committee
On April 29, 2008 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Health Care Policy Committee
- Hearing Conducted H Health Care Policy Committee
On April 17, 2008 in the House:
- Referred H Health Care Policy Committee
On March 10, 2008 in the House:
- H Second Read
On March 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
On March 6, 2008 in the House:
- H First Read
On February 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor
- Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
- Hearing Conducted S Governmental Accountability & Fiscal Oversight
On February 27, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
On February 26, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee
- Perfected
- SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Justus)--(3119S.04F)
On February 19, 2008 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On February 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Seniors, Families and Public Health Committee to Floor w/SCS
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families and Public Health Committee (3119S.02C)
On January 29, 2008 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Public Health Committee
On January 10, 2008 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Seniors, Families and Public Health Committee
On January 9, 2008 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 778-Justus
On December 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor