+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 16, 2008 in the Senate:
- S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 776-Justus and Koster, with SCS
On March 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On February 21, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Seniors, Families and Public Health Committee to Floor w/SCS
On February 19, 2008 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families and Public Health Committee (3120S.02C)
On February 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Public Health Committee
On January 10, 2008 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Seniors, Families and Public Health Committee
On January 9, 2008 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 776-Justus and Koster
On December 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor