+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On May 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 775-Schaefer
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing Scheduled But Not Heard S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 775-Schaefer
On December 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor