+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On May 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 774-Schmitt
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing Cancelled S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 774-Schmitt
On December 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor