+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 18, 2012 in the House:
- S Calendar S Bills with H Amendments--SCS for SB 773-Parson, with HA 2 & HA 3
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- Motion to concur in HA 2 withdrawn
- H Third Read and Passed, as amended - EC adopted
- HA 3 H offered & adopted (Conway)--(5719S03.01H)
- HA 2 H offered & adopted (Dugger)--(5719S03.07H)
- HA 1 H offered & defeated (Hummel)--(5719S03.03H)
- Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee
- Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- Referred H Fiscal Review Committee
- Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f)
- Reported Do Pass H Elections Committee
- Voted Do Pass H Elections Committee
- Hearing Conducted H Elections Committee
On February 17, 2012 in the House:
- H Second Read
- Referred H Elections Committee
On February 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted
- Reported from S Ways & Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor
- Voted Do Pass S Ways & Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee
- Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee
On February 16, 2012 in the House:
- H First Read w/EC
On February 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Motion to suspend Rule 52 and take up bill for perfection S adopted
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee - (5719S.03C)
- Reported from S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee to Floor w/SCS
- Perfected
- SA 1 to SCS S offered & defeated (Rupp)--(5719S03.02S)
- SCS S adopted
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee
- Referred S Ways & Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
On February 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
On February 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 773-Parson
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor