+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (67)
On July 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by House Speaker
- Signed by Senate President Pro Tem
- Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
- Delivered to Governor
On May 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
On May 13, 2016 in the House:
- CCS H Third Read and Passed
- CCR H adopted
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- CCS S Third Read and Passed
- CCR S offered & adopted
On May 12, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
- Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
On May 11, 2016 in the House:
- Referred H Fiscal Review Committee
- H distributes CCR
On May 3, 2016 in the House:
- S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended and requests H recede or grant conference
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- S conferees appointed: Schmitt, Cunningham, Dixon, Keaveny, Walsh
On May 3, 2016 in the House:
- H refuses to recede and grants conference
- H conferees appointed: Cornejo, McGaugh, Curtman, McCreery, Adams
On May 2, 2016 in the House:
- HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Brattin)--(4939H04.14H)
- HA 2 to HCS H offered (Fraker)--(4939H04.19H)
- HA 1 to HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Rhoads)--(4939H04.49H)
- HA 2 to HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Miller)--(4939H04.36H)
- HA 2 to HCS, as amended, H adopted
- HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Wilson)--(4939H04.12H)
- HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Brown-57)--(4939H04.50H)
- HA 5 to HCS H offered (Roden)--(4939H04.08H)
- HA 1 to HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Higdon)--(4939H04.27H)
- HA 7 to HCS H offered & adopted (Hough)--(4939H04.17H)
- HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Wood)--(4939H04.34H)
- HA 5 to HCS, as amended, H adopted
- HA 8 to HCS H offered & adopted (Rowland)--(4939H04.07H)
- HA 2 to HA 12 to HCS H offered & adopted (Davis)--(4939H04.57H)
- H Third Read and Passed - EC defeated
- HCS, as amended, H adopted
- HA 12 to HCS, as amended, H adopted
- HA 9 to HCS H offered (Lant)--(4939H04.09H)
- HA 3 to HA 12 to HCS H offered & adopted (Remole)--(4939H04.56H)
- HA 1 to HA 12 to HCS H offered & adopted (McGaugh)--(4939H04.59H)
- HA 12 to HCS H offered (Walker)--(4939H04.40H)
- HA 11 to HCS H offered & adopted (Hubrecht)--(4939H04.23H)
- HA 10 to HCS H offered & adopted (Eggleston)--(4939H04.53H)
- HA 9 to HCS, as amended, H adopted
- HA 1 to HA 9 to HCS H offered & adopted (Hinson)--(4939H04.30H)
On April 27, 2016 in the House:
- Laid over
- Taken up
- Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
- Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
On April 25, 2016 in the House:
- Referred H Fiscal Review Committee
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Judiciary (Pursuant to H Rule 27.9)
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Judiciary (Pursuant to H Rule 27.9)
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Referred H Select Committee on Judiciary (Pursuant to H Rule 27.9)
- Reported Do Pass H Civil and Criminal Proceedings w/HCA 1 & 2
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Civil and Criminal Proceedings w/Amendments
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Civil and Criminal Proceedings
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Referred H Civil and Criminal Proceedings
- H Second Read
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- H First Read
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Perfected
- SCS S adopted
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee w/SCS
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee (4939S.03C)
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 765-Schmitt
On December 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (40)
4939S.07S
CCS S Third Read and Passed
4939S07.1SR
CCR S offered
4939S07.01F
Distributed
4939H04.59H
Adopted
4939H04.48H
Distributed
4939H04.58H
Distributed
4939H04.57H
Adopted
4939H04.56H
Adopted
4939H04.54H
Distributed
4939H04.53H
Adopted
4939H04.51H
Distributed
4939H04.50H
Adopted
4939H04.35H
Distributed
4939H04.36H
Adopted
4939H04.38H
Distributed
4939H04.40H
Offered
4939H04.45H
Distributed
4939H04.49H
Adopted
4939H04.30H
Adopted
4939H04.34H
Adopted
4939H04.27H
Adopted
4939H04.28H
Distributed
4939H04.26H
Distributed
4939H04.23H
Adopted
4939H04.17H
Adopted
4939H04.22H
Distributed
4939H04.19H
Adopted
4939H04.18H
Distributed
4939H04.21H
Distributed
4939H04.16H
Distributed
4939H04.15H
Distributed
4939H04.14H
Adopted
4939H04.09H
Adopted
4939H04.12H
Adopted
4939H04.11H
Distributed
4939H04.07H
Adopted
4939H04.04H
Distributed
4939H04.08H
Adopted
4939S03.01H
Committee
4939S03.02H
Committee
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor