+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 18, 2001 in the House:
- 010 H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading
On May 15, 2001 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Urban Affairs Committee
On April 17, 2001 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Urban Affairs Committee
On April 10, 2001 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Urban Affairs Committee
On March 29, 2001 in the House:
- Referred H Urban Affairs Committee
On March 15, 2001 in the House:
- H Second Read
On March 14, 2001 in the House:
- H First Read
On March 14, 2001 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - Consent
On March 13, 2001 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Budget Control Committee
- Voted Do Pass S Budget Control Committee
- Reported From S Budget Control Committee to Floor
On March 6, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred S Budget Control Committee
On February 27, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported From S Ways & Means Committee to Floor - Consent
On February 20, 2001 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Ways & Means Committee-Consent
On January 23, 2001 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee
On January 16, 2001 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee
On January 3, 2001 in the Senate:
- S First Read
On December 1, 2000 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor