+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On June 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by House Speaker
- Signed by Senate President Pro Tem
- Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
On May 7, 2004 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed to and Finally Passed
- S Third Read and Passed
- S concurs in HCA 1
On May 5, 2004 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed, as amended - Consent
- HCA 1 H adopted
On April 22, 2004 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass w/HCA 1 H Transportation & Motor Vehicle Committee-Consent
On April 21, 2004 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass w/HCA 1 H Transportation & Motor Vehicle Committee-Consent
On April 14, 2004 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Transportation & Motor Vehicle Committee
On April 1, 2004 in the House:
- Referred H Transportation & Motor Vehicles Committee
On March 18, 2004 in the House:
- H Second Read
On March 17, 2004 in the House:
- H First Read
On March 16, 2004 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - Consent
- SCS S adopted
On February 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported From S Transportation Committee to Floor w/SCS - Consent
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Transportation Committee-Consent (3086S.03C)
On February 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Transportation Committee
On January 8, 2004 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Transportation Committee
On January 7, 2004 in the Senate:
- S First Read
On December 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor