+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (43)
On May 18, 2018 in the House:
- In Conference--SB 757-Schatz, with HA 1, HA 3, HA 4, HA 5, HA 6, HA 8 & HA 9
On May 17, 2018 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Tate, Eggleston, Reiboldt, Adams, Franks, Jr.
- H refuses to recede and grants conference
- S refuses to concur in HA 1, HA 3, HA 4, HA 5, HA 6, HA 8 & HA 9 and requests H recede or grant conference
On May 14, 2018 in the House:
- HA 2 H withdrawn
- HA 3 H offered & adopted (Eggleston)--(4675S01.04H)
- HA 4 H offered & adopted (Redmon)--(4675S01.17H)
- HA 5 H offered & adopted (Sommer)--(4675S01.03H)
- HA 6 H offered & adopted (Evans)--(4675S01.11H)
- HA 7 H offered & adopted (Franks Jr.)--(4675S01.23H)
- HA 8 H offered & adopted (Dogan)--(4675S01.14H)
- HA 7 H Vote Reconsidered
- HA 7 H withdrawn
- HA 9 H offered & adopted (Franks Jr.)--(4675S01.27H)
- H Third Read and Passed, as amended
On May 11, 2018 in the House:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
- Bill placed back on Formal Calendar
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- Bill placed on Informal Calendar
- HA 2 H offered (Rhoads)--(4675S01.16H)
- HA 1 H offered & adopted (Tate)--(4675S01.05H)
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Bill placed on Informal Calendar
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass H Transportation
- Voted Do Pass H Transportation
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Transportation
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- Referred H Transportation
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- H Second Read
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- H First Read
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Perfected
- Bill placed on Informal Calendar
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Local Government and Elections Committee
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Removed S Consent Calendar
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Local Government and Elections Committee - Consent
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Local Government and Elections Committee - Consent vote adopted
- Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 757-Schatz
On December 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (26)
4675S01.40H
Distributed
4675S01.39H
Distributed
4675S01.38H
Distributed
4675S01.37H
Distributed
4675S01.33H
Distributed
4675S01.32H
Distributed
4675S01.30H
Distributed
4675S01.31H
Distributed
4675S01.23H
Withdrawn
4675S01.27H
Adopted
4675S01.22H
Distributed
4675S01.26H
Distributed
4675S01.21H
Distributed
4675S01.14H
Adopted
4675S01.15H
Distributed
4675S01.16H
Withdrawn
4675S01.17H
Adopted
4675S01.18H
Distributed
4675S01.19H
Distributed
4675S01.20H
Distributed
4675S01.02H
Distributed
4675S01.13H
Distributed
4675S01.11H
Adopted
4675S01.05H
Adopted
4675S01.04H
Adopted
4675S01.03H
Adopted
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor