+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection w/SCS
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee w/SCS
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee (1031S.02C)
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing Cancelled S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
On January 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
On January 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- S First Read
On December 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor