+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On May 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Ways and Means Committee
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee
On January 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- S First Read
On December 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor