+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On July 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by House Speaker
- Signed by Senate President
- Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
On May 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
On May 16, 2012 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed
- H recedes on HA 1
On May 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Laid over (H)
- Motion to recede on HA 1 withdrawn
On May 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- S requests H recede or grant conference
- S refuses to concur in HA 1
On April 19, 2012 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed, as amended - EC adopted
- HA 1 H offered & adopted (Zerr)--(4528S01.01H)
On April 17, 2012 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee
- Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee
- Hearing Conducted H Rules Pursuant Committee
On April 11, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f)
- Reported Do Pass H Local Government Committee
On April 4, 2012 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Local Government Committee
On March 21, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Local Government Committee
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- Referred H Local Government Committee
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- H Second Read
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- H First Read
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee
- Perfected
On February 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee to Floor
On February 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Removed S Consent Calendar
- Reported from S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee to Floor - Consent
On February 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee - Consent
On February 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee
On February 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee
On February 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 736-Engler
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor