+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (39)
On May 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- In Conference--SCS for SB 726-Parson, with HCS, as amended
On May 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- S conferees appointed: Parson, Kehoe, Engler Callahan, McKenna
On May 16, 2012 in the House:
- H conferees appointed: Wells, Joines-89, Molendorp, Swinger, Talboy
- H refuses to recede and grants conference
On May 15, 2012 in the House:
- HA 1 to HSA 1 for HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Hinson)--(5514H04.22H)
- HA 1 to HA 1 to HCS H offered (Talboy)--(5514H04.38H)
- HA 1, as amended, H adopted
- HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Molendorp)--(5514H04.36H)
- HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Leara)--(5514H04.20H)
- HA 4 to HCS H offered (Smith-150)--(5514H04.01F)
- HSA 1 for HA 4 to HCS H offered (Rowland)--(5514H04.48H)
- HA 1 to HCS H offered (Nolte)--(5514H04.19H)
- HSA 1 for HA 4 to HCS, as amended, H adopted
- HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Franz)--(5514H04.12H)
- HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Cox)--(5514H04.07H)
- HA 7 to HCS H offered & adopted (Dieckhaus)--(5514H04.13H)
- HCS, as amended, H adopted
- H Third Read and Passed - EC defeated
On May 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended
- S requests H recede or grant conference
On May 1, 2012 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee
- Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee
- Hearing Conducted H Rules Pursuant Committee
On April 19, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f)
- HCS Reported Do Pass H Financial Institutions Committee
On April 18, 2012 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Financial Institutions Committee
On April 11, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Financial Institutions Committee
On April 3, 2012 in the House:
- Referred H Financial Institutions Committee
On March 19, 2012 in the House:
- H Second Read
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- H First Read
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
On March 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee
- Perfected
- SCS S adopted
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee to Floor w/SCS
On February 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee - (5514S.02C)
On February 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
On February 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
On January 31, 2012 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 726-Parson
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor