+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 16, 2014 in the House:
- S Calendar S Bills with H Amendments--SS for SCS for SB 707-Wasson, with HCS, as amended
- H Third Read and Passed
- HCS, as amended, H adopted
- HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Schatz)--(4810H09.07H)
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee
- Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee
On May 6, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to H Rules Committee
- HCS Reported Do Pass H Agri-Business Committee
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Agri-Business Committee
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Agri-Business Committee
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Referred H Agri-Business Committee
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- H Second Read
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- H First Read
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
- Perfected, as amended
- SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Wasson)--(4810S.05F)
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Transportation and Infrastructure Committee to Floor w/SCS
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Transportation and Infrastructure Committee (4810S.04C)
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
On January 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 707-Wasson
+ − Amendment
4810S.05F
Adopted
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor