+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 2, 2002 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Social Services, Medicaid & the Elderly Committee
On April 9, 2002 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Social Services, Medicaid & the Elderly Committee
On April 5, 2002 in the House:
- Referred H Social Services, Medicaid & the Elderly Committee
On February 18, 2002 in the House:
- H Second Read
On February 14, 2002 in the House:
- H First Read
On February 13, 2002 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - Consent
On January 29, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported From S Aging, Families & Mental Health Committee to Floor - Consent
- Voted Do Pass S Aging, Families & Mental Health Committee-Consent
On January 22, 2002 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Aging, Families & Mental Health Committee
On January 14, 2002 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Aging, Families & Mental Health Committee
On January 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- S First Read
On December 1, 2001 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor