+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On July 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by House Speaker
- Signed by Senate President Pro Tem
- Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
- Delivered to Governor
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- S concurs in HA 1
- S concurs in HA 3
- S concurs in HA 4
- S Third Read and Passed, as amended
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed, as amended
- HA 4 H offered & adopted (Hummel)--(5130S01.03H)
- HA 3 H offered & adopted (Diehl)--(5130S01.02H)
- HA 2 H offered & defeated (Cookson)--(5130S01.07H)
- HA 1 H offered & adopted (Thomson)--(5130S01.09H)
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Elementary and Secondary Education Committee - Consent
- Hearing Conducted H Elementary and Secondary Education Committee
- Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee - Consent
- Reported Do Pass H Elementary and Secondary Education Committee - Consent
- Referred to H Rules Committee
- Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee - Consent
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Referred H Elementary and Secondary Education Committee
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- H Second Read
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- H First Read
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - Consent
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Education Committee to Floor - Consent
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Education Committee - Consent vote adopted
- Voted Do Pass S Education Committee
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Education Committee
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Education Committee
On January 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 701-Lager
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor