+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 14, 2004 in the House:
- H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading
On May 6, 2004 in the House:
- Referred H Budget Committee-Fiscal Review
On May 5, 2004 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Local Government Committee
On April 8, 2004 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Local Government Committee
- Hearing Conducted H Local Government Committee
On March 11, 2004 in the House:
- Referred H Local Government Committee
On March 8, 2004 in the House:
- H Second Read
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- H First Read
On March 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
On March 2, 2004 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
- Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
- Reported From S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor
On March 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- Hearing Cancelled S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
On February 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred S Governmental Accountability & Fiscal Oversight Committee
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee
On February 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- Perfected
- SCS S adopted
On February 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported From S Economic Development, Tourism & Local Government Committee to Floor w/SCS
On February 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Economic Development, Tourism and Local Government Committee (2970S.03C)
On January 14, 2004 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Economic Development, Tourism and Local Government Committee
On January 8, 2004 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Economic Development, Tourism and Local Goverment Committee
On January 7, 2004 in the Senate:
- S First Read
On December 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor