+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On May 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 695-Parson
On March 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee to Floor
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee
On February 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee
On February 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee
On January 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 695-Parson
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor