+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (45)
On May 13, 2016 in the House:
- In Conference--SB 677-Sater, with HCS, as amended
On May 9, 2016 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
- Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
On May 3, 2016 in the House:
- Referred H Fiscal Review Committee
- H distributes CCR
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- S conferees appointed: Sater, Wasson, Riddle, Chappelle-Nadal, Schupp
On April 27, 2016 in the House:
- H conferees appointed: Representatives Franklin, Entlicher, Lynch, Kirkton, Arthur
- H refuses to recede and grants conference
- S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended and requests H recede or grant conference
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Davis)--(4546H02.27H)
- HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Franklin)--(4546H02.24H)
- HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Brown)--(4546H02.04H)
- HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Hubrecht)--(4546H02.05H)
- HA 5 to HCS H offered (Jones)--(4546H02.26H)
- HA 1 to HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Kirkton)--(4546H02.32H)
- HA 5 to HCS, as amended, H adopted
- HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Cornejo)--(4546H02.11H)
- HA 7 to HCS H offered & adopted (Kelley)--(4546H02.19H)
- HA 8 to HCS H offered & adopted (Lynch)--(4546H02.22H)
- HA 9 to HCS H offered & adopted (Roeber)--(4546H02.17H)
- HA 10 to HCS H offered & adopted (Bondon)--(4546H02.25H)
- HA 11 to HCS H offered & adopted (McGaugh)--(4546H02.18H)
- HA 12 to HCS H offered & adopted (Hubrecht)--(4546H02.13H)
- HA 13 to HCS H offered & adopted (Solon)--(4546H02.03H)
- HCS, as amended, H adopted
- H Third Read and Passed - EC defeated
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Social Services (Pursuant to H Rule 27.12)
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Social Services (Pursuant to H Rule 27.12)
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Referred H Select Committee on Social Services (Pursuant to H Rule 27.12)
- Reported Do Pass H Health and Mental Health Policy w/HCA 1
- Voted Do Pass H Health and Mental Health Policy w/Amendments
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Health and Mental Health Policy
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Referred H Health and Mental Health Policy
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- H Second Read
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- H First Read
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Perfected, as amended
- SA 1 S offered & adopted (Sater)
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee
On January 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee
- Hearing Conducted S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 677-Sater
On December 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (24)
4546S04.01F
Distributed
4546H02.32H
Adopted
4546H02.27H
Adopted
4546H02.26H
Adopted
4546H02.25H
Adopted
4546H02.28H
Distributed
4546H02.24H
Adopted
4546H02.18H
Adopted
4546H02.15H
Distributed
4546H02.17H
Adopted
4546H02.19H
Adopted
4546H02.22H
Adopted
4546H02.13H
Adopted
4546H02.11H
Adopted
4546H02.12H
Distributed
4546H02.10H
Distributed
4546H02.09H
Distributed
4546H02.01H
Distributed
4546H02.03H
Adopted
4546H02.07H
Distributed
4546H02.05H
Adopted
4546H02.04H
Adopted
4546S01.01H
Committee
4546S01.01S
SA 1 offered (Sater)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor