+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 10, 2003 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Education Committee
On April 7, 2003 in the House:
- Referred H Education Committee
On April 3, 2003 in the House:
- H Second Read
On April 2, 2003 in the House:
- H First Read (w/EC)
On April 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted - Consent
- SCS S adopted
On March 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported From S Education Committee to Floor w/SCS - Consent
On March 11, 2003 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee-Consent (2031S.02C)
- Hearing Conducted S Education Committee
On March 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Education Committee
On February 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- S First Read
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor