+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 18, 2012 in the House:
- H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
On May 1, 2012 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee
- Hearing Conducted H Rules Pursuant Committee
On April 26, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f)
- HCS Reported Do Pass H Elections Committee
On April 25, 2012 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Elections Committee
On April 24, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Elections Committee
On April 17, 2012 in the House:
- Referred H Elections Committee
On March 30, 2012 in the House:
- H Second Read
On March 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
On March 29, 2012 in the House:
- H First Read
On March 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee
On March 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Perfected
- SCS, as amended, S adopted
- SA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Crowell)--(5044S04.03S)
On March 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from S General Laws Committee to Floor w/SCS
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee (5044S.04C)
- Committee Vote Reconsidered
On March 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee
On February 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee
On February 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee
On January 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 671-Parson
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor