+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by House Speaker
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate President Pro Tem
- Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee
- Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Referred H Fiscal Review Committee
- Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee
- Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee
- Referred to H Rules Committee
- Reported Do Pass H General Laws Committee
- Voted Do Pass H General Laws Committee
- Hearing Conducted H General Laws Committee
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Referred H General Laws Committee
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- H Second Read
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- H First Read
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
- Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor
- Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Perfected
- SS, as amended, S adopted
- SA 1 to SS S offered & adopted (Silvey)--(5155S02.01S)
- SS S offered (Silvey)--(5155S.02F)
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee to Floor
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 668-Silvey
+ − Amendments (2)
5155S02.01S
Adopted
5155S.02F
Adopted, as amended
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor