+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On May 15, 2020 in the House:
- S Bills with H Amendments--SCS for SB 662-Bernskoetter, with HCS, as amended
On May 5, 2020 in the House:
- HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Evans)--(3931H05.10H)
- HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Billington)--(3931H05.03H)
- HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Veit)--(3931H05.04H)
- HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Ross)--(3931H05.19H)
- HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Dinkins)--(3931H05.25H)
- HA 6 to HCS H offered (Roberts)--(3931H05.26H)
- HA 1 to HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Christofanelli)--(3931H05.32H)
- HA 6, as amended, to HCS H adopted--(3931H05.26H)
- HA 7 to HCS H offered & adopted (Roden)--(3931H05.12H)
- HA 8 to HCS H offered & adopted (Kelley)--(3931H05.07H)
- HA 9 to HCS H offered & adopted (Pollitt)--(3931H05.22H)
- HA 10 to HCS H offered & adopted (Bosley)--(3931H05.11H)
- HCS, as amended, H adopted
- H Third Read and Passed - EC defeated
On May 4, 2020 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
- Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
On May 1, 2020 in the House:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On April 30, 2020 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
- Referred H Fiscal Review Committee
On April 29, 2020 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass H Special Committee on Regulatory Oversight and Reform
- Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight
On April 28, 2020 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Special Committee on Regulatory Oversight and Reform
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Special Committee on Regulatory Oversight and Reform
On April 27, 2020 in the House:
- Referred H Special Committee on Regulatory Oversight and Reform
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- H Second Read
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- H First Read
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- SCS S adopted
- Perfected
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee (3931S.03C)
- Reported from S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee w/SCS
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee
On January 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 662-Bernskoetter
On December 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (20)
3931H05.32H
Adopted
3931H05.28H
Distributed
3931H05.31H
Distributed
3931H05.29H
Distributed
3931H05.26H
Offered
3931H05.25H
Adopted
3931H05.24H
Distributed
3931H05.14H
Distributed
3931H05.22H
Adopted
3931H05.19H
Adopted
3931H05.17H
Distributed
3931H05.16H
Distributed
3931H05.15H
Distributed
3931H05.10H
Adopted
3931H05.12H
Adopted
3931H05.11H
Adopted
3931H05.07H
Adopted
3931H05.04H
Adopted
3931H05.03H
Adopted
3931H04.01F
Distributed
+ − Sponsor
Bernskoetter
Type:
Primary Sponsor