+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On July 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by House Speaker
- Signed by Senate President Pro Tem
- Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
- S Third Read and Passed
- S concurs in HCS, as amended
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed
- HCS, as amended, H adopted
- HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Jones-50)--(4143H04.01H)
On May 8, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to H Rules Committee
- HCS Reported Do Pass H General Laws Committee
On May 6, 2014 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass H General Laws Committee
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H General Laws Committee
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing Cancelled H General Laws Committee
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Referred H General Laws Committee
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- H Second Read
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- H First Read
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Perfected, as amended
- SA 2 S offered & adopted (Schmitt)--(4143S01.02S)
- SA 1 S offered & adopted (Libla)--(4143S01.01S)
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee to Floor
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing Cancelled S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 655-Kraus
On January 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (2)
4143S01.01S
Adopted
4143S01.02S
Adopted
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor