+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On May 17, 2002 in the Senate:
- 001 S Calendar S Bills for Perfection w/SCS
On May 3, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported From S Public Health & Welfare Committee to Floor w/SCS
On February 13, 2002 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Public Health & Welfare Committee (2652.03C)
On February 6, 2002 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Public Health & Welfare Committee
On January 10, 2002 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Public Health & Welfare Committee
On January 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- S First Read
On December 1, 2001 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor