+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 18, 2001 in the Senate:
- S Inf Calendar S Bills for Perfection w/SCS
On March 5, 2001 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On February 8, 2001 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee
- Reported From S Ways & Means Committee to Floor w/SCS
On January 23, 2001 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee
On January 16, 2001 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee
On January 3, 2001 in the Senate:
- S First Read
On December 1, 2000 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor