+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 65-White, with SS (pending)
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- SS S offered (White)
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Government Reform Committee
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Government Reform Committee
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Government Reform Committee
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Government Reform Committee
On January 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 65-White
On December 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendment
0353S.05F
SS S offered (White)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor