+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 12, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 26, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by House Speaker
- Delivered to Governor
On May 17, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate President
- Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
On April 24, 2006 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
On April 24, 2006 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed
On April 5, 2006 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee
On April 4, 2006 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee
- Hearing Conducted H Rules Committee
On March 29, 2006 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Job Creation & Economic Development Committee
- Hearing Conducted H Job Creation & Economic Development Committee
- Reported Do Pass H Job Creation & Economic Development Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(26)(f)
On March 16, 2006 in the House:
- Referred H Job Creation & Economic Development Committee
On February 13, 2006 in the House:
- H Second Read
On February 9, 2006 in the House:
- H First Read
On February 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
On February 8, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee
- Perfected
On February 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On February 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Economic Development, Tourism & Local Government Committee to Floor
On January 30, 2006 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Economic Development, Tourism & Local Government Committee
On January 18, 2006 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Economic Development, Tourism & Local Government Committee
On January 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Economic Development, Tourism & Local Government Committee
On January 4, 2006 in the Senate:
- S First Read
On December 1, 2005 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor