+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On July 3, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 28, 2002 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by House Speaker
- Signed by Senate President
- Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
On May 6, 2002 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
On May 6, 2002 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed - Consent
On April 11, 2002 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Motor Vehicle & Traffic Regulations Committee - Consent
- Voted Do Pass H Motor Vehicle & Traffic Regulations Committee - Consent
On April 9, 2002 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Motor Vehicle & Traffic Regulations Committee
On April 5, 2002 in the House:
- Referred H Motor Vehicle & Traffic Regulations Committee
On February 14, 2002 in the House:
- H Second Read
On February 13, 2002 in the House:
- H First Read
On February 12, 2002 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - Consent
On January 28, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported From S Transportation Committee to Floor - Consent
On January 23, 2002 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Transportation Committee-Consent
On January 15, 2002 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Transportation Committee
On January 10, 2002 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Transportation Committee
On January 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- S First Read
On December 1, 2001 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor