+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 12, 2006 in the House:
- H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading
On April 27, 2006 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee
On April 26, 2006 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee
- Hearing Conducted H Rules Committee
On April 25, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(26)(f)
- Reported Do Pass H Agriculture Policy Committee
- Voted Do Pass H Agriculture Policy Committee
On April 18, 2006 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Agriculture Policy Committee
On April 12, 2006 in the House:
- Referred H Agriculture Policy Committee
On April 10, 2006 in the House:
- H Second Read
On April 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
On April 6, 2006 in the House:
- H First Read
On April 5, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee
On April 4, 2006 in the Senate:
- Perfected
On March 7, 2006 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On February 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Agriculture, Conservation, Parks & Natural Resources Committee to Floor
On February 22, 2006 in the Senate:
- Removed S Consent Calendar
On February 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Agriculture, Conservation, Parks & Natural Resources Committee to Floor - Consent
On February 8, 2006 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Conservation, Parks & Natural Resources Committee - Consent
On February 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Agriculture, Conservation, Parks & Natural Resources Committee
On January 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Agriculture, Conservation, Parks & Natural Resources Committee
On January 4, 2006 in the Senate:
- S First Read
On December 1, 2005 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor